Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Berlin, Stephen, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Berlin, Kristen, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HELINGER, JACK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage - With Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION-ORDER TERMINATE PARENT COORDINATOR
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
July 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED BY COURT
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR STATUS CONFERENCE BY PARENTING COORDINATOR
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE BY PARENTING COORDINATOR
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE PROPOSED ORDER RCVD BY COURT 102615
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
FAXED OR PHOTO COPY OF RESPONSE BY PARENTING COORDINATOR RECD BY CT 101615
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
October 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 101215 9:15
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.