Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Rentthebay Com Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Bell, Troy, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2013 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD UNEXECUTED
Date: February 11, 2014PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: January 21, 2014CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: BELL, TROY
Date: December 20, 2013WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF MLD TO EVICTIONS PLUS
Date: January 28, 2014SUMMONS - SERVED 122113 Party: BELL, TROY
Date: December 23, 2013FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: January 27, 2014FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF Vol./Book 18291, Page 744, 1 pages
Date: January 24, 2014DEFAULT ENTERED Party: BELL, TROY
Date: January 23, 2014PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT
Date: January 21, 2014PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION PRO SE
Date: January 21, 2014CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 20, 2013AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE
Date: January 21, 2014AUTHORIZATION TO REPRESENT OF CORPORATE OFFICER
Date: December 20, 2013AUTHORIZATION TO REPRESENT OF MANAGEING MEMBER
Date: December 20, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD UNEXECUTED
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF MLD TO EVICTIONS PLUS
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF Vol./Book 18291, Page 744, 1 pages
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO)
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED WITHOUT CHECK
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Party: BELL, TROY
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
UNSIGNED ORDER SENT TO JUDGE
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.