Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Solomon, Kenneth, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Brown, Sadie Mae, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with LOGAN, WALTER D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage - No Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION Vol./Book 18265, Page 908, 2 pages
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
December 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 122013 9:45
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
November 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Party: BROWN, SADIE MAE
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
November 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
November 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
November 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
November 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
ATTACHMENT SUMMONS
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.