Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Federal National Mortgage Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Roy A Diaz, Esq, against Learn, Gregory R, Learn, Heidi, The Gardens 103 Inc, The Gardens Community Council Inc, Wells Fargo Bank Na, (total of 5) See All represented by Monique E Parker, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DAY, JACK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2013 |
CategoryReal Prop - Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by the Plaintiff, Federal National Mortgage Association (FNMA), against the Defendants, Gregory R. Learn, Heidi Learn, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., The Gardens Community Council, Inc., The Gardens 103, Inc., Un...
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: LEARN, HEIDI
Date: December 16, 2013CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT
Date: December 17, 2015SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: September 30, 2013ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF THE GARDENS 103, INC
Date: October 15, 2013AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY Party: LEARN, HEIDI
Date: December 13, 2013PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: October 02, 2014NOTICE OF HEARING 040715 9:15
Date: February 26, 2015NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL
Date: June 23, 2015AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Date: July 01, 2015NOTICE OF HEARING 081715 1:30
Date: July 22, 2015FORM B - NOTICE TO HOMEOWNER
Date: September 30, 2013FORM A-PLAINTIFF CERTIFICATE
Date: September 30, 2013LIS PENDENS Vol./Book 18182, Page 2515, 1 pages
Date: September 30, 2013VALUE OF REAL PROP-MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: September 30, 2013EXHIBIT CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE W/MORTGAGE
Date: October 02, 2013CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: September 30, 2013COMPLAINT
Date: October 02, 2013SUMMONS - NOT SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 1
Date: August 19, 2015SUMMONS - SERVED 100813 THE GARDENS 103, INC
Date: August 19, 2015SUMMONS - NOT SERVED HEIDI LEARN
Date: August 19, 2015INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK
Date: December 13, 2013SUMMONS - SERVED 102213 GREGORY R. LEARN
Date: August 19, 2015NOTICE OF ACTION EMAILED - BUSINESS OBSERVER Party: LEARN, HEIDI
Date: December 16, 2013PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT 30 DAYS
Date: December 27, 2013AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Date: January 29, 2014NOTICE OF HEARING 071514 9:00 (TELEPHONIC)
Date: June 13, 2014NOTICE OF HEARING 071514
Date: July 03, 2014CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: October 13, 2015NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND ORIGINAL MORTGAGE
Date: July 14, 2014AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS
Date: July 16, 2014PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: July 16, 2014NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTIES
Date: August 19, 2014AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Date: August 19, 2014AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Date: August 29, 2014COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE DOCUMENTS NOT PROCESSED
Date: September 08, 2014NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE W/FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES
Date: January 12, 2015AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS W/ATTACHED BUSINESS RECORDS
Date: May 14, 2015NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS AND PAYMENT HISTORY
Date: May 14, 2015CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES
Date: October 13, 2015NOTICE OF SALE
Date: November 04, 2015NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTIES
Date: July 01, 2015SUMMONS - NOT SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 2
Date: August 19, 2015SUMMONS - SERVED 101013 THE GARDENS COMMUNITY COUNCIL, INC
Date: August 19, 2015NOTICE OF HEARING 10/13/15 2:30
Date: September 11, 2015NOTICE OF HEARING - CROSS NOTICE 10/13/15 2:30
Date: September 11, 2015CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES
Date: October 12, 2015FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE Vol./Book 18957, Page 2105, 7 pages
Date: October 13, 2015FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: October 13, 2015ORDER GRANTING PLTF MTN FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT BY THE CLERK
Date: October 13, 2015CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: October 17, 2015CERTIFICATE OF SALE FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Date: December 04, 2015AFFIDAVIT OF POST JUDGMENT INTEREST AND ADVANCES
Date: November 25, 2015PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE
Date: November 13, 2015CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Vol./Book 19024, Page 512, 1 pages
Date: December 17, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Vol./Book 19024, Page 512, 1 pages
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) REC VER
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
November 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF POST JUDGMENT INTEREST AND ADVANCES
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
October 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES
Judge: DAY, JACK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.