Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pmt Npl Financing 2014-1, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Jaclyn E Jones, against Bank Of America Na, Bay Cities Bank, Bingham, Patricia, Branch Banking And Trust Company, Cornerstone Community Bank, (total of 23) See All represented by Scott Michael Alexander, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MINKOFF, THOMAS H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2013 |
CategoryReal Prop - Non-Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURNED FROM POST OFFICE COPY OF CERTIFICATES | |
May 04, 2016 | Docket Event | COPY CORRESPONDENCE RE: gENERAL ELECTRIC CAPITAL CORPORATION WITHDREW TO DO BUSINESS IN FL | |
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Vol./Book 19162, Page 1901, 1 pages | |
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT | |
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURNED FROM POST OFFICE CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | COPY CORRESPONDENCE RE NOT REGISTERED AGENT | |
April 07, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE PMT NPL FINANCING 2014-1 | |
April 07, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) REC | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE | |
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event | COPY CORRESPONDENCE RE NOT REGISTERED AGENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.