Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Josh Arthur, Esq, against All Unknown Parties Claiming Etc, Bank Of America Na, Martinenko, Donna M, Midland Funding Llc, Neuhauser, William, (total of 8) See All represented by Gregg Dreilinger, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DAY, JACK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2013 |
CategoryReal Prop - Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
November 19, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS Vol./Book 18601, Page 345, 1 pages | |
November 19, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
November 19, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | MEDIATION CONFERENCE REPORT | |
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY (AMENDED) | |
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER REFERRAL FORECLOSURE MEDIATION | |
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY | |
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event | FORM A-PLAINTIFF CERTIFICATE | |
December 13, 2013 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR REQUEST OF PARTICIPATION IN MEDIATION PROGRAM - PRO SE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.