Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Advanced Chiropractic And Rehabilitation Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Andrew D Reeder, Esq, against Usaa Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Randall A Wainoris, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with FULLERTON, WALTER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2013 |
CategorySmall Claims Pip 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: October 03, 2014RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: March 20, 2014NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 20, 2014REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: January 08, 2014DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND
Date: February 10, 2014NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 10, 2014REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: December 19, 2013ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: January 29, 2014NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: December 20, 2013NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: September 03, 2014DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PROVIDE ANSWERS
Date: March 20, 2014NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: February 12, 2014NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL
Date: January 08, 2014REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: December 19, 2013REPLY AND MOTN TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OR MOTN FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT
Date: January 30, 2014(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: October 15, 2014SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: December 20, 2013RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: March 20, 2014NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT VIA ATTORNEY Party: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: December 20, 2013NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 08, 2014COMPLAINT E-FILED
Date: December 19, 2013STATEMENT OF CLAIM - E-FILED
Date: December 19, 2013INTERROGATORIES
Date: December 19, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING ATTACHED AFFIDAVIT OF WENDY HIRALDO WITH EXHIBIT A-DECLARATIONS PAGE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PROVIDE ANSWERS
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.