Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Solera Partners Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Brian P Wolk, Esq, against Boykins, Ursula, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2013 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
EXHIBIT APARTMENT LEASE CONTRACT
Date: September 30, 2013CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: September 30, 2013DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)
Date: September 30, 2013EXHIBIT THREE DAY NOTICE TO PAY RENT
Date: September 30, 2013COMPLAINT
Date: September 30, 2013CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: BOYKINS, URSULA
Date: October 01, 2013SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED 100213 URSULA BOYKINS
Date: October 04, 2013AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Date: October 08, 2013PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: October 10, 2013ATTORNEY COVER LETTER
Date: October 11, 2013DEFAULT ENTERED /E Party: BOYKINS, URSULA
Date: October 11, 2013FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION IN FAVOR OF PLTFF Vol./Book 18201, Page 1559, 1 pages
Date: October 17, 2013PLTF-PET'S PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION
Date: October 21, 2013WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO ATTORNEY EMAILED
Date: October 23, 2013WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED
Date: November 05, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO ATTORNEY EMAILED
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION IN FAVOR OF PLTFF Vol./Book 18201, Page 1559, 1 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO)
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
UNSIGNED ORDER SENT TO JUDGE
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED /E Party: BOYKINS, URSULA
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.