Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Scow Of Florida Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Andrew D Reeder, Esq, against Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Kimberly A Sandefer, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HESSINGER, KATHLEEN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2013 |
CategorySmall Claims Pip 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: August 24, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
CANCELED DISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T) ORDER FROM COURT
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE/
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF GOOD CAUSE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES (REMOVED FROM MASTER ORDER)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) AMENDED AND CHANGE OF ATTORNEY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
CANCELED DISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T) ORDER FROM COURT
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF GOOD CAUSE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.