Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Greene, Stephanie Barba, Florida Department Of Revenue, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Brainard, Jeffrey Nathan, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ST. JOHN, SUSAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2013 |
CategoryIv-D Support |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
ARREARS CALCULATION SHEET
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
|
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINDINGS-ORDER OF COURT RE SUSPENDING CHILD SUPPORT WITH ATTACHED IDO
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
|
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
RESPONDENT'S QUESTIONNAIRE ENTERED AS EXHIBIT
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
|
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING 062017 2:30
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
|
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
ARREARAGE AFFIDAVIT ENTERED AS EXHIBIT
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
|
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING 062017 2:30
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
|
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 06/20/17 230
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION SUSPEND SUPPORT PRO SE Filed by: GREENE, STEPHANIE BARBA
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS APPROVED
Judge: ST. JOHN, SUSAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.