Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Florida Department Of Revenue, Cartagena, Denise, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Ramos, Ernest R, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RAMSBERGER, PETER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2013 |
CategoryIv-D Foreign Judgment Registration - Uifsa |
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Doc # 13 EMAILED TO PA/CS IS CLSD
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE REDIRECT SUPPORT FROM DOR Doc # 12
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (R) Doc # 10 Vol./Book 21503, Page 699, 1 pages
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Doc # 11 CASE CLOSED
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Doc # 9 LIEN PAYOFF STATEMENT W/ ATTACH
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CURRENT ADDRESS Doc # 8
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
RESPONDENT'S QUESTIONNAIRE Doc # 5 ENTERED AS EXHIBIT
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
ARREARAGE AFFIDAVIT Doc # 7 ENTERED AS EXHIBIT
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINDINGS-ORDER OF CONTEMPT Doc # 6
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 2 110117 10:30
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.