Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank N A, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Thomas Mcfadyen, Esq, against Clerk Of The Circuit Court For Pinellas County Florida, Unknown Spouse Of Brandy M Vergara, Vergara, Brandy M, Vergara, Brandy M, Personal Rep, Vergara, Stephanie, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2013 |
CategoryReal Prop - Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a verified complaint to foreclose a mortgage filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. against Brandy M. Vergara, Individually and as Personal Representative of The Estate of Roberto C. Vergara, Deceased, and Stephanie Vergara a/k/a Stephanie...
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: September 02, 2014NOTICE OF SALE
Date: December 23, 2014FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE Vol./Book 18519, Page 541, 5 pages
Date: September 02, 2014AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS
Date: August 21, 2014NOTICE OF SALE
Date: September 25, 2014NOTICE OF FILING SUPP AFFIDAVIT AS TO AMOUNTS DUE/OWING
Date: August 21, 2014NOTICE OF HEARING 090214 9:00
Date: August 11, 2014ORDER RESCHED ONLINE SALE 011215
Date: October 07, 2014ATTACHMENT BUSINESS RECORDS
Date: August 21, 2014ATTORNEY COVER LETTER
Date: September 02, 2014AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: April 09, 2014CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES
Date: April 23, 2014AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS
Date: April 09, 2014ALIAS SUMMONS - NOT SERVED BRANDY VERGAR PERSONAL REP
Date: November 07, 2013ALIAS SUMMONS - NOT SERVED UNKWN SPOUSE OF BRANDY VERGARA
Date: November 07, 2013REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS
Date: September 18, 2013NOTICE OF DROPPING
Date: March 10, 2014ALIAS SUMMONS - NOT SERVED BRANDY VERGARA
Date: November 07, 2013PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE
Date: January 05, 2015ORDER CANCELLING FORECLOSURE SALE 101614 AND
Date: October 07, 2014CERTIFICATE OF SALE WELLS FARGO BANK NA
Date: January 12, 2015COMPLAINT
Date: March 29, 2013PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE
Date: October 03, 2014AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTN TO CANCEL/RESCHEDULE SALE
Date: September 30, 2014FORM A-PLAINTIFF CERTIFICATE
Date: March 29, 2013EXHIBIT NOTE
Date: April 03, 2014CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 29, 2013PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE AND RESHCEDULE SALE
Date: September 30, 2014AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS
Date: April 09, 2014CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Vol./Book 18664, Page 76, 2 pages
Date: January 28, 2015NOTICE OF FILING MORTGAGE
Date: April 03, 2014NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE
Date: April 07, 2014PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 09, 2014NOTICE BORROWER NONPART FORECLOSURE MEDIATION AND CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION SET 082313
Date: August 12, 2013ORDER REFERRAL FORECLOSURE MEDIATION
Date: June 06, 2013AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL
Date: April 09, 2014CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY
Date: July 23, 2013NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 07, 2014NOTICE OF FILING NOTE
Date: April 03, 2014PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT 30 DAYS
Date: December 13, 2013EXHIBIT MORTGAGE
Date: April 03, 2014AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Date: March 07, 2014AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY Party: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BRANDY M VERGARA
Date: November 25, 2013SUMMONS - NOT SERVED BRANDY M VERGARA Party: VERGARA, BRANDY M
Date: May 29, 2013INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK
Date: November 25, 2013AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY Party: VERGARA, BRANDY M
Date: November 25, 2013AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY Party: VERGARA, BRANDY M, PERSONAL REP
Date: November 25, 2013NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Vol./Book 17951, Page 473, 2 pages
Date: March 29, 2013VALUE OF REAL PROP-MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: March 29, 2013CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT
Date: January 28, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Vol./Book 18664, Page 76, 2 pages
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE WELLS FARGO BANK NA
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) REC VER
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
October 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
CANCELED JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) ORDER FROM COURT REC
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER RESCHED ONLINE SALE 011215
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER CANCELLING FORECLOSURE SALE 101614 AND
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.