Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jp Morgan Chase Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sujata J Patel, against Rothrock, Neil D, Rothrock, Vanessa R, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SHAMES, MARK I presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2013 |
CategoryReal Prop - Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association against Neil D. Rothrock, Vanessa R. Rothrock, and unknown tenants. The plaintiff alleges that on August 20, 2010, a promissory note was executed in the origina...
SUMMONS - SERVED 040913 VANESSA R ROTHROCK Party: ROTHROCK, VANESSA R
Date: May 29, 2013CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT
Date: March 31, 2014ANSWER OF PRO-SE Party: ROTHROCK, VANESSA R
Date: April 24, 2013SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Party: UNKNOWN TENANT II
Date: April 24, 2013ORDER REFERRAL FORECLOSURE MEDIATION
Date: May 02, 2013SUMMONS - SERVED NEIL D ROTHROCK 051713 Party: ROTHROCK, NEIL D
Date: June 03, 2013WRIT OF POSSESSION
Date: June 06, 2014MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PURCHASER
Date: April 23, 2014FORM A-PLAINTIFF CERTIFICATE
Date: March 29, 2013NOTICE OF SALE
Date: February 07, 2014FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE Vol./Book 18233, Page 1415, 6 pages
Date: November 18, 2013COMPLAINT
Date: March 29, 2013NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT TO AMOUNTS DUE AND OWING
Date: August 14, 2013WITNESS LIST AND EXHIBIT LIST
Date: October 29, 2013COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE DOCIMENT NOT PROCESSED
Date: April 29, 2014NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Vol./Book 17950, Page 1764, 2 pages
Date: March 29, 2013CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: October 29, 2013CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE RETN ORIG MTG
Date: December 02, 2013FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: November 18, 2013PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT PROPOSED DEFAULT BY CLERK
Date: October 01, 2013AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Date: October 01, 2013VALUE OF REAL PROP-MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: March 29, 2013ORDER FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION
Date: April 25, 2014CERTIFICATE OF SALE JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Date: March 18, 2014CERTIFICATE OF NO TENANTS
Date: April 23, 2014NOTICE OF DROPPING UNKNOWN TENANT I; UNKNOWN TENANT II
Date: October 01, 2013WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO ATTY 5/16/14
Date: May 16, 2014PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE
Date: February 21, 2014SUMMONS - NOT SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT 1 Party: UNKNOWN TENANT I
Date: May 29, 2013DEFAULT ENTERED Party: ROTHROCK, NEIL D
Date: October 09, 2013CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Vol./Book 18354, Page 1269, 1 pages
Date: March 31, 2014DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)
Date: April 23, 2014CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 29, 2013DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Party: PATEL, SUJATA J
Date: March 29, 2013CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE RETURN CHECK NOT PROCESSED
Date: April 17, 2014ORDER SCHEDULING NON-JURY TRIAL 111813 9:00
Date: October 10, 2013NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE
Date: November 18, 2013ASSIGNMENT OF BID
Date: March 17, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO ATTY 5/16/14
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
April 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE DOCIMENT NOT PROCESSED
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
April 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PURCHASER
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO TENANTS
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE RETURN CHECK NOT PROCESSED
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
March 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
March 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Vol./Book 18354, Page 1269, 1 pages
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.