Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cms Vrs Flagler Lp, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Charles V Barrett, Iii, against Pryor, Mona, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2013 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
This complaint is an action to evict a tenant from a property in Pinellas County, Florida. The plaintiff, CMS VRE II Flagler, L.P., alleges that the defendant, Mona Pryor, has failed to pay rent on the property located at 6367 24th Street South, Apt....
SUMMONS - SERVED MONA PRYOR 032913
Date: April 03, 2013CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: PRYOR, MONA
Date: March 29, 2013NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION RETD BY P.O. UNKNOWN ADDRESS FOR DEFT MONA PRYOR
Date: April 07, 2014MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL PRYOR, MONA Vol./Book 18432, Page 1083, 4 pages
Date: June 11, 2014COMPLAINT COUNT 1 AND 2
Date: March 29, 2013CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 29, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL PRYOR, MONA Vol./Book 18432, Page 1083, 4 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
June 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN)
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION RETD BY P.O. UNKNOWN ADDRESS FOR DEFT MONA PRYOR
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
April 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED MONA PRYOR 032913
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: PRYOR, MONA
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT COUNT 1 AND 2
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS TO PROCESS SERVER Party: PRYOR, MONA
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.