Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa N A, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Flynn Lavrar, Esq, against Rorer, Teresa, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HESSINGER, KATHLEEN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2013 |
CategorySmall Claims 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT VIA ATTORNEY
Date: April 05, 2013MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL RORER, TERESA Vol./Book 18535, Page 1958, 7 pages
Date: September 19, 2014NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE
Date: March 29, 2013AFFIDAVIT OF LSOT SUMMONS TERESA RODER
Date: December 03, 2013NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: April 05, 2013STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: March 29, 2013AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE
Date: December 03, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL RORER, TERESA Vol./Book 18535, Page 1958, 7 pages
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
September 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
August 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF LSOT SUMMONS TERESA RODER
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer FULLERTON, WALTER) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SERVICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
April 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT VIA ATTORNEY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
April 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.