Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ross, Davel Mario, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case against Florida Dept Of Corrections, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BAIRD, W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBAIRD, W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2012 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus - Circuit |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: ROSS, DAVEL MARIO
Date: November 13, 2013ORDER DISMISSING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS Vol./Book 17774, Page 342, 20 pages
Date: October 23, 2012NOTICE OF INQUIRY RE: STATUS PRO SE
Date: November 08, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: ROSS, DAVEL MARIO
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
November 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INQUIRY RE: STATUS PRO SE
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
February 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Doc # 1 OF INQUIRY PRO SE
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
January 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION CORRECT ILLEGAL SENTENCE PRO SE
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
October 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER DISMISSING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS Vol./Book 17774, Page 342, 20 pages
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
October 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
CC ORDER TRANSFER CAUSE FROM WAKULLA CO FL W/ORIGINAL PLEADINGS ATTACHED
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
CASE FILED Party: FLORIDA DEPT OF CORRECTIONS
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.