Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Floyd, Jacquelyn L, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Dennis Hernandez, against Hall, Michael D, represented by Bryce P Spano, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JIROTKA, GEORGE M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/ PREJUDICE OR17234PG1738-002; VER: F; P Vol./Book 17234, Page 1738, 002 pages
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
April 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT BEFORE HRG (SRS DISPO) Comment: DISMISSED PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT BEFORE HRG; VER: F; P
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
April 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECD BY COURT 041211; VER: F; P
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
April 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION Comment: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL; VER: F; P
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
April 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE Comment: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; VER: F; P
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
February 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; D
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED MICHAEL D HALL 010711; VER: F; K
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
January 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Comment: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; VER: F; D
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
January 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Comment: AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; VER: F; D
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.