Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Baisden, Cliffette J, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Collins, John C, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RAMSBERGER, PETER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Injunction With Kids |
Last RefreshedJanuary 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF ORDER EXTENDING DISMISSED; VER: F; P
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
February 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION; VER: F; P
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
February 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; K
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
January 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
CC TEMPORARY INJUNCTION WITHOUT NOTICE RETD Comment: C/C TEMPORARY INJUNCTION W/O NOTICE RETD EXTENDED; VER: F; K
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
January 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER EXTENDING INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION Comment: ORDER EXTENDING INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION 020310 @ 9AM; VER: F; K
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
January 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
CC PETITION WITH ATTACHMENTS TO SHF Comment: 2 C/C PETITION W/ATTACHMENTS TO SHF; VER: N; K
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
January 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
HEARING (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer RAMSBERGER, PETER)
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
CASE FILED
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
PETITIONER'S FINANCIAL STATEMENT-AFFIDAVIT Comment: FINANCIAL STATEMENT/AFFIDAVIT; VER: F; P
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
CASE CALENDARED FOR Comment: CASE CALENDARED FOR 011310 09:00; VER: N; P
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.