Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jackson, Edward, Florida State Ofdepartment Of Revenue, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against West, Shaikil D, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SHAMES, MARK I presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryForeign Judgment Registration - Uifsa - Non Ivd |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
ARREARS CALCULATION SHEET Comment: ARREARS CALCULATION SCREEN; VER: F; K
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
July 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
DEPOSITORY NOTICE REMOVING DOR FROM CASE Comment: DOR LOCATION CHANGED TO NONE FROM SOUTH BY 9936; VER: N; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
July 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO REMOVE CASE FROM COURT SUPERV. Comment: ORDER TO REMOVE CASE FROM COURT SUPERV.; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
July 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
July 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
RECOMMENDATION OF HEARING OFFICER WITH ATTACHED Comment: RECOMMENDATION OF HEARING OFFICER WITH ATTA; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
June 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
HEARING (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer SHAMES, MARK I)
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
DEPOSITORY NOTICE OF REDIRECTION OF SUPPORT Comment: DEPOSITORY NOTICE OF REDIRECTION OF SUPPORT; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 017 FROM SECTION HSO BY 3859 - RANDOM F A; VER: N; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
June 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
CASE CALENDARED FOR Comment: CASE CALENDARED FOR CSO ON 062910 AT 09:30; VER: N; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
May 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 062910 9:30; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.