Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Richard Rogachefsky M D P A, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Ronald A Alter, against Jutis, Peter, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McNARY, MYRA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
May 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
COPY Comment: COPY ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL-RETD SERVED; VER: F; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
May 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Comment: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
April 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING Comment: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
April 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
March 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
March 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
March 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING Comment: ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
March 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 040411 1:15-TELEPHONIC; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
March 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO COMPEL Comment: MOTION TO COMPEL; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.