Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Thomas, Patricia Marie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ronald I Croft, against Folles, Kelly Ann, Folles, Marie, represented by Ann Lehr Ohern, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DEMERS, DAVID A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDEMERS, DAVID A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DROPPING Comment: NOTICE OF DROPPING ;; VER: F; P
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
|
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
ID NAME Comment: KELLY ANN FOLLES /; VER: F; P
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
|
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
ID NAME Comment: MARIE FOLLES; VER: F; P
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
|
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
|
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
WITH PREJUDICE Comment: WITH PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
|
November 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Comment: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 122209; VER: F; P
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
|
November 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Comment: NOTICE OF ACCPETANCE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (2); VER: F; D
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
|
November 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES Comment: REQUEST FOR COPIES; VER: F; P
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
|
November 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Comment: NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (2); VER: F; P
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
|
October 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Comment: NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT; VER: F; D
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.