Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Srb Servicing Llc, Synovus Bank, United Bank And Trust Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Rabian M Brooks, Iii, against 1202 Sheridan Trust, 1884 Murray Land Trust, 1934 Overbrook Trust, 48 Broadway Trust, Brown, Donn, (total of 13) See All represented by Mark P Stopa, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BOYER, BRUCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBOYER, BRUCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event | UNDER THRESHOLD FUNDS TRANSFERRED TO FINE & FORFEITURE FUND | |
June 23, 2011 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM TO CLERK Comment: MEMORANDUM TO CLERK ACTG TO REFUND DOC STAMPS/PD TWICE; VER: F; K | |
June 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Refund To Be Issued - $ Comment: REFUND TO BE ISSUED - $ 910.70 TO THIRD PARTY; VER: F; K | |
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE HANDED TO RICHARD AVICHOUSER; VER: F; K | |
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event | AS TO: Comment: FOR: AVAILABLE PROCEEDS SRB SERVICING VS MDJ HOLDING; VER: N; A | |
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event | AS TO: Comment: TO: SRB SERVICING LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNOVUS BANK; VER: N; A | |
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event | TEXT Comment: COURT REGISTRY CHECK NUMBER: 943132 $130100.00; VER: N; A | |
June 21, 2011 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS Comment: CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS; VER: F; K | |
June 21, 2011 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED: OR17282PG1921-002; VER: R; K Vol./Book 17282, Page 1921, 002 pages | |
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Doc Stamps - Fee Paid $ Comment: DOC STAMPS - FEE PAID $910.70; VER: N; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.