Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Michelle Garcia Gilbert, against Bybee, Alvin D, Bybee, Patricia S, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BOYER, BRUCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBOYER, BRUCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2008 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE RETURN CHECK #369084 $49, 10/10 SALE SOLD TO 3RD PARTY
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Vol./Book 17780, Page 788, 1 pages
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
October 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE 2012-b property holdings llc
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
October 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
TEXT DATE_DOCKETED: 082212
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
October 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) ver 10/10/2012 Reset by Court to 10/10/2012 10/10/2012 Reset by Court to 10/10/2012
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
September 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT Comment: ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT/BID/WELLS FARGO BANK NA; VER: F; P
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
August 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
UNIFORM FINAL JUDGMENT - BACKLOG PROJECT Comment: UNIFORM FINAL JUDGEMENT - BACKLOG PROJECT; VER: F; P
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
August 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
SALE SCHEDULED ONLINE DATE: 20121010; SEQ: 999; LOCAL: O; DATE_DOCKETED: 082212
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.