Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Suntrust Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Amy S Tingley, against Bayway Isles-Point Brittany Four Condominium Corp, Walker, Florence A Tr, Walker, Philip E Tr, represented by Astrid Guardado, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DAY, JACK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAY, JACK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2008 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event | REOPEN - CLOSED | |
August 26, 2010 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Comment: CORR FROM CLERK RE:RETURNING WRIT AND CHECK CASE DISMISSED; VER: F; K | |
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER Comment: ORDER FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION - NOT SIGNED; VER: F; P | |
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECD BY COURT 072810; VER: F; P | |
July 22, 2010 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED W/CHECK; VER: N; P | |
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Reopen Fee Paid $ Comment: RE-OPEN FEE PAID - $50.00; VER: N; P | |
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION; VER: F; P | |
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF NO TENANTS; VER: F; P | |
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED Comment: REOPEN CASE/OTHER; VER: N; P | |
June 21, 2010 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Comment: CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE:WRIT AND CKK RTND/NO REC ACTIV; VER: F; K |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.