Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hsbc Mortgage Services Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Shannon Arsenault, against Lea, Robert, Lea, Therese L, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Parkfield Estates Homeowners Assoc Inc, represented by Astrid Guardado, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2008 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RE-RECORDED TO SHOW DOC STAMPS Vol./Book 18031, Page 1122, 1 pages | |
May 13, 2013 | Docket Event | COPY CERTIFICATE OF SALE RETURNED BY POST OFFICE Party: LEA, ROBERT | |
March 05, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Vol./Book 17916, Page 2188, 1 pages | |
March 05, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT | |
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC | |
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) REC VER | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE | |
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
December 18, 2012 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE Vol./Book 17828, Page 1520, 5 pages | |
December 18, 2012 | Docket Event | UNIFORM FINAL JUDGMENT - BACKLOG PROJECT (SRS) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.