Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pinellas County Sheriff, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Sherwood S Coleman, against Gardner, Adam R, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MORRIS, ROBERT J, JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMORRIS, ROBERT J, JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 09, 2008 |
CategoryForfeiture |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2009 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT (SRS) Comment: JUDGMENT; VER: N; P | |
January 08, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT OR16468PG2476-002; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16468, Page 2476, 002 pages | |
January 08, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
December 24, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE Comment: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; VER: F; P | |
November 07, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED ADAM R GARDNER 110508; VER: F; K | |
October 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons - Fee Paid $ Comment: SUMMONS FEE PAID $10.00; VER: N; P | |
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Comment: SUMMONS /INTEROFFICE TO SHF; VER: N; K | |
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR Comment: REQUEST FOR: SUMMONS; VER: F; P | |
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event | FINDINGS OF PROBABLE CAUSE Comment: FINDINGS OF PROBABLE CAUSE AND ORDER TO ANSWER; VER: F; P | |
October 14, 2008 | Docket Event | THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 001 FROM SECTION HNO BY 8463 - MANUAL A; VER: N; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.