Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Muncy, Misty Michelle, Florida State Of Department Of Revenue, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Bare, Jonas Seth, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with GREER, GEORGE W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGREER, GEORGE W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2008 |
CategoryIv-D Uifsa |
Last RefreshedFebruary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: GREER, GEORGE W |
|
June 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: GREER, GEORGE W |
|
June 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; VER: F; P
Judge: GREER, GEORGE W |
|
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK SERVICE) BY 000000 MAILE Comment: NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK SERVICE) BY: 062209 MAILED AS TO:; VER: N; K
Judge: GREER, GEORGE W |
|
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S) Comment: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S) (S)/PLTF(S) ATTY(S); VER: N; K
Judge: GREER, GEORGE W |
|
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK SERVICE) BY 000000 MAILE Comment: BARE JONAS SETH (REMOVED FROM MASTER ORDER); VER: N; K
Judge: GREER, GEORGE W |
|
January 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD NOT SERVED JONAS SETH BARE; VER: F; K
Judge: GREER, GEORGE W |
|
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS TO SHERIFF Comment: SUMMONS TO SHERIFF; VER: N; K
Judge: GREER, GEORGE W |
|
December 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 014 BY 4789 - RANDOM FD; VER: N; P
Judge: GREER, GEORGE W |
|
December 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Comment: NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE; VER: F; P
Judge: GREER, GEORGE W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.