Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wilson, Richard Allen, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Kroitzsch, Michelle Dawn, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HELINGER, JACK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHELINGER, JACK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2008 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Injunction Without Kids |
Last RefreshedJanuary 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK RE CASE INFORMATION INQUIRY
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
July 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS Comment: AFFIDAVIT/SERVICE OF PROCESS INJ; VER: F; P
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
January 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; K
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
January 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
HEARING (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer HELINGER, JACK)
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
January 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION-DOM VIOLENCE Comment: FINAL JUDGEMENT OF INJUNCTION/DOM VIOLENCEOR16470PG0524-007; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16470, Page 0524, 007 pages
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
January 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS Comment: AFFIDAVIT/SERVICE OF PROCESS TEMP INJ; VER: F; P
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
December 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S INFORMATION SHEET Comment: CLERKS INFORMATION SHEET; VER: F; K
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
December 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
CASE CALENDARED FOR Comment: CASE CALENDARED FOR 010809 09:00; VER: N; P
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
December 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET Comment: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VER: F; P
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
December 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
CASE FILED
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.