Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Robert J Orovitz, against Meranda, Sharon A, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJAGGER, EDWIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - County |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
September 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDING Comment: C/C JUDGEMENT MADE/HANDED RECORDING; VER: R; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
August 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER FOR EXECUTION OR16687PG2239-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16687, Page 2239, 001 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
August 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reopen Fee Paid $ Comment: RE-OPEN FEE PAID - $50.00 //; VER: N; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
August 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
August 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: NOTICE OF DEFAULT AND DEMAND FOR EXECUTION ORDER; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
August 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED Comment: REOPEN CASE/OTHER; VER: N; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS) Comment: JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT EXECUTION WITHHELD; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION Comment: STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT ETC; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.