Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Chase Bank Usa N A, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Lisa Dolin Eiss, against Sapaugh, Joy D, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with VACCARO, DOROTHY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVACCARO, DOROTHY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2008 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - County |
Last RefreshedFebruary 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
LETTER FROM CLERK RE NO DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: LETTER FROM CLERK RE: NO DEFAULT ENTERED / NOTICE OF; VER: N; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
March 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
ID NAME Comment: BANKRUPTCY FILED 030209; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
March 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
March 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
March 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Suggestion Of Bankruptcy Comment: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY; VER: F; D
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
January 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED JOY D SAPAUGH 010709; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Summons - Fee Paid $ Comment: SUMMONS FEE PAID $10.00; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
County Civil Filing - Fee Paid $ Comment: COUNTY CIVIL FILING FEE PAID $300.00; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS TO SHERIFF Comment: SUMMONS TO SHERIFF; VER: N; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT AND COPY(S) Comment: COMPLAINT AND COPY(S); VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.