Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Knapmeyer, Jan, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by William A Borja, against Evans, Tarashanda, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with VACCARO, DOROTHY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVACCARO, DOROTHY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2008 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
January 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR Comment: REQUEST FOR: RTN $140 CHK; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
January 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION R; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
January 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR Comment: REQUEST FOR: WRIT OF POSSESSION W/CHECK $70; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
January 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
January 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS) Comment: JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
January 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION OR16474PG0084-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16474, Page 0084, 001 pages
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
January 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
ID NAME Comment: TARASHANDA EVANS; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
January 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Comment: SUMMONS RETD WITH NO SERVICE ATTACHED; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
January 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.