Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mhc Operating Limited Partnership, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Daniel M Hartzog, Jr, against Paul, Shirley A, Paul, James R, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McNARY, MYRA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2008 |
CategoryOther Real Property - County |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED; VER: F; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF; VER: F; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED W/CHECK; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT - COUNT 1 POSSESSION OR16472PG0145-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16472, Page 0145, 001 pages
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT I; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED/ JAMES R PAUL/ SHIRLEY A PAUL- COUNT I; VER: N; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
December 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
December 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.