Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rijo Group Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Jorge L Palma, Esq, against Bell, Mickey, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with VACCARO, DOROTHY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVACCARO, DOROTHY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2008 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
August 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
August 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 048 FROM SECTION NPC BY 9345 - MANUAL S; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
August 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Comment: ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME COMPLETE SERVICE; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
August 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
EX-PARTE MOTION Comment: EX-PARTE MOTION: ENLARGEMENT OF TIME; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
June 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer VACCARO, DOROTHY)
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
FAX COPY OF CORRESPONDENCE Comment: FAX COPY OF CORRESPONDENCE: CONTINUE PENDING SERVICE; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
June 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
NO SERVICE LETTER MAILED Comment: NO SERVICE LETTER MAILED-PRETRIAL CANCELLED; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
ALIAS NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED Comment: ALIAS NOTICE RETURNED NOT SERVED; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
May 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Comment: NOTICE/STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT/PROCESS SERVER; VER: N; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.