Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jordan Park Development Partners Ltd, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by John E Mcmillan, Esq, against Wheeler, Marshae, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 31, 2008 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedOctober 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
December 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
December 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
May 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING STIP FOR PAYMENT Comment: ORDER APPROVING STIP FOR PAYMENT OR16258PG2248-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16258, Page 2248, 001 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
May 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
May 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Comment: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
May 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD UNEXECUTED; VER: F; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
April 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED MLD TO ATTY; VER: N; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
April 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR Comment: REQUEST FOR: WRIT OF POSSESSION; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
April 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
COPY Comment: COPY OF WRIT OF POSSESSION; VER: F; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.