Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Tarr, Janis Nicole, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case against In Re, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ANDREWS, MICHAEL F presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryName Change |
Last RefreshedFebruary 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeName Change |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
COLLECTIONS RECEIVED BY LINEBARGER GOGGAN BLAIR
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
April 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
COLLECTIONS REFERRED TO AGENCY Comment: REFERRED TO COLLECTION AGENCY; VER: N; A Party: TARR, JANIS NICOLE
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
October 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT Comment: NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT; VER: F; K
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
May 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Partial Payment $ Comment: PARTIAL PAYMENT $30.00; VER: N; A
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT Comment: NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
February 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK Comment: CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK; VER: N; K
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
February 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
NAME CHANGE REPORT OF FINAL JDMT TO FDLE Comment: NAME CHANGE REPORT OF FINAL JDMT TO FDLE; VER: N; K
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
February 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Partial Payment $ Comment: PARTIAL PAYMENT $10.00; VER: N; A
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
February 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT OF NAME CHANGE OR16163PG1437-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16163, Page 1437, 001 pages
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
February 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.