Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Harrison, Martin W, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Baker, Kellie A, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with LOGAN, WALTER D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLOGAN, WALTER D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Injunction With Kids |
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
COPY Comment: COPY PINELLA CO JUSTICE INFO SYSTEM; VER: F; P
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
January 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION OR16115PG1302-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16115, Page 1302, 001 pages
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
January 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; K
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
January 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
HEARING (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer LOGAN, WALTER D)
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
January 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF TEMP INJ; VER: F; P
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
CC PETITION WITH ATTACHMENTS TO SHF Comment: 2 C/C PETITION W/ATTACHMENTS TO SHF; VER: N; K
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 024 FROM SECTION 022 BY 8568 - MANUAL C; VER: N; P
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET Comment: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VER: F; P
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
SEALED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER PLAINTIFF - PETITIONER Comment: SEALED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; VER: F; P
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 022 BY 8568 - RANDOM FD; VER: N; P
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.