Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Shone, Patricia Jean, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Shone, Jack, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with VACCARO, DOROTHY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage - Simplified |
Last RefreshedOctober 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER DENYING MTN TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL OR16150PG0126-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16150, Page 0126, 001 pages
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL-SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL OR16139PG0761-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16139, Page 0761, 001 pages
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: JOINT MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
HEARING (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer VACCARO, DOROTHY)
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Circuit Civil Filing - Fee Paid $ Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE PAID $363.00; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
COPY Comment: COPY DRIVERS LICENSE; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
CASE FILED
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.