Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Brewster, Tanya L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Page, Scott Robert, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with GREER, GEORGE W presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedJanuary 05, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PLAINTIFF Comment: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PLAINTIFF; VER: F; P
Judge: GREER, GEORGE W |
|
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PLAINTIFF Comment: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PLAINTIFF; VER: F; K
Judge: GREER, GEORGE W |
|
December 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT BY OPERATION OF LAW Comment: JUDGMENT BY OPERATION OF LAW OR16446PG1687-001; VER: R; K Vol./Book 16446, Page 1687, 001 pages
Judge: GREER, GEORGE W |
|
November 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF OVERDUE SUPPORT PAYMENTS Comment: NOTICE OF OVERDUE SUPPORT PAYMENTS RETD BY P O; VER: F; D
Judge: GREER, GEORGE W |
|
November 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF OVERDUE SUPPORT PAYMENTS Comment: NOTICE OF OVERDUE SUPPORT PAYMENTS COPY; VER: F; K
Judge: GREER, GEORGE W |
|
January 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK Comment: CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK; VER: N; K
Judge: GREER, GEORGE W |
|
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
ARREARS CALCULATION SHEET Comment: ARREARS CALCULATION SCREEN; VER: F; K
Judge: GREER, GEORGE W |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER Comment: INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER; VER: F; P
Judge: GREER, GEORGE W |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS) Comment: JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: GREER, GEORGE W |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Comment: NOTICE OF FILING ATTACHED; VER: N; P
Judge: GREER, GEORGE W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.