Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Richard Valle, against Frost, Randlph J, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MINKOFF, THOMAS H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECD BY COURT 081811; VER: F; P
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER COMPELLING DEFT TO COMPLETE/RETURN FACT INFO SHEET; VER: F; P
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
July 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RCVD BY COURT 071811; VER: F; P
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
June 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 070711 3:00; VER: F; P
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER ALLOWING APPEARANCE BY TELEPHONE 060211 3:00; VER: F; P
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
COPY Comment: COPY MOTION TO APPEA BY TELEPHONE; VER: F; P
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
April 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 060211 3:00; VER: F; P
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
April 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE; VER: F; P
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
April 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED Comment: REOPEN CASE/OTHER; VER: F; P
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
April 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDR COMPEL DEFT COMPLETE FACT SHEET-NOT SIGNED BY COURT; VER: F; P
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.