Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
World Savings Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Michael J Eisler, against Schurer, Ann J, Unknown Tenant 1, Unknown Tenant 2, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RONDOLINO, ANTHONY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRONDOLINO, ANTHONY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Doc Stamps - Fee Paid $ Comment: DOC STAMPS - FEE PAID $350.70; VER: N; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RETD BY PO (2); VER: F; D
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY Comment: CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY; VER: N; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
December 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
COPY Comment: COPY CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RETD BY PO; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT Comment: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT; VER: F; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED: OR17098PG0569-001; VER: R; K Vol./Book 17098, Page 0569, 001 pages
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
November 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
Realauction Electronic Sale Fee Paid $ Comment: REALAUCTION ELECTRONIC SALE FEE PAID $49.00; VER: N; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
November 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
COPY Comment: COPY CERTIFICATE OF SALE RETURNED BY PO; VER: F; D
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
November 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
COPY Comment: COPY CERTIFICATE OF SALE RETURNED BY PO; VER: F; D
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.