Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Saltzman, Cindy As Pr, Saltzman Isadore Estate Of, filed a(n) Other Civil - Circuit case represented by Eric D Roslansky, Esq, against Brooke Group Holding Inc, Liggett Group Llc, Lorillard Tobacco Company, Philip Morris Usa Inc, R J Reynolds Tobacco Company, (total of 6) See All represented by Benjamin H Hill, Iii, Eric J Partlow, Esq, Lewis J Conwell, Maria H Ruiz, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ALLAN, LINDA R presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
CategoryOther Civil - Circuit |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
|
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 2
Date: December 13, 2017REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 4
Date: September 12, 2018REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 5
Date: July 10, 2019REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 6
Date: March 12, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 6
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 5
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 4
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 2
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
CANCELED DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer NEWTON, CYNTHIA J) CURRENT ACTIVITY
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF AMENDMENT TO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT 12 TRANSCRIPT TRIAL VOLUME 351 062899
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.