Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Agoado, Harry, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Steven N Tsangaris, Esq, against Hannah, Justin, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KHOUZAM, NELLY N presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECD BY COURT 042910; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
July 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
July 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
July 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT OR16947PG0074-002; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16947, Page 0074, 002 pages
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
May 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 061510 9:00; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
April 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Comment: NOTICE OF FILING ATTACHED AFFIDAVITS; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
April 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECORDED AT Comment: RECORDED AT: OR16308PG0162-001; VER: N; P Vol./Book 16308, Page 0162, 001 pages
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.