Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wood, Jean, White, Maureen, White, Marie, White, John, White, Francis, (total of 83) See All filed a(n) Other Civil - County case represented by Frederick W Vollrath, against One Or More John And Or Jane Does, Nickel Plate Properties Inc, represented by Marion Hale, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with VACCARO, DOROTHY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryOther Civil - County |
Last RefreshedFebruary 06, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
CASE TRANSFERRED (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE TRANSFERRED; VER: N; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: MOTION /ORDER TO TRANSFER TO CIRCUIT COURT; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
March 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Comment: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; VER: F; D
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
INTERROGATORIES Comment: INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT (THIRD); VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
March 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
INTERROGATORIES Comment: SECOND INTERROGATORIES TO NICKEL PLATE PROPERTIES; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
March 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PRODUCE Comment: NOTICE TO PRODUCE AT DEPOSITION; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
March 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Comment: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION AND; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
February 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; D
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
February 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Comment: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; D
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
February 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Comment: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; VER: F; D
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.