Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Montambault, Lynn, Montambault, Edward, Jr, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Sheldon L Wind, against Smith, Robert L, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - County |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
November 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER DISMISSING GARNISHMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
November 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
COURT WORKSHEET Comment: COURT WORKSHEET; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
November 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 111908 2:00; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
November 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reopen Fee Paid $ Comment: RE-OPEN FEE PAID - $50.00; VER: N; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
November 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 111908 @2:00; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
November 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR CONTEMPT Comment: MOTION CONTEMPT; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
November 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED Comment: REOPEN CASE/OTHER; VER: N; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
November 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE FROM CLERK RE REOPEN FEE REQUIRED Comment: NOTICE FROM CLERK RE: REOPEN FEE REQ/MTN ORDER OF CONTEMPT; VER: N; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
November 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NON-ATTENDANCE OF Comment: CERTIFICATE OF NON-ATTENDANCE OF: ROBERT L SMITH 070308; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.