Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wri Countryside Centre Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Martin J Shuham, against Dhd Enterprises Inc, represented by R Gale Porter, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED; VER: F; K
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
July 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION MLD TO ATTY; VER: F; K
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
July 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER FOR CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION; VER: F; P
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
July 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: MOTION WRIT OF POSSESSION; VER: F; P
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
July 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED Comment: REOPEN CASE/OTHER; VER: N; P
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED W/OUT CHECK; VER: F; P
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: MOTION WRIT OF POSSESSION; VER: F; P
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT - COUNT 1 POSSESSION OR16189PG1947-002; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16189, Page 1947, 002 pages
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS) Comment: JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.