Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Palisades Acquisition Xvi, Unifund Ccr Partners G P, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Dale Workman, against Monroe, Thomas J, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - County |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
UNCLAIMED REGISTRY FUNDS DEPOSITED WITH STATE UNDER F.S.717 43.19 / 2016
Date: April 07, 2017ORDER RE DEPOSIT UNCLAIMED REGISTRY FUNDS UNDER F.S.43.19 43.19 Civil-2016
Date: November 30, 2016ORDER RE DEPOSIT UNCLAIMED REGISTRY FUNDS UNDER F.S.43.19 PER FL STAT 43.19 FOR 2015
Date: November 23, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
UNCLAIMED REGISTRY FUNDS DEPOSITED WITH STATE UNDER F.S.717 43.19 / 2016
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER RE DEPOSIT UNCLAIMED REGISTRY FUNDS UNDER F.S.43.19 43.19 Civil-2016
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER RE DEPOSIT UNCLAIMED REGISTRY FUNDS UNDER F.S.43.19 PER FL STAT 43.19 FOR 2015
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
WITHOUT PREJUDICE Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISS AS DESIGNATED: Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISS AS DESIGNATED: GARNISHMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
AS TO: Comment: TO: POLLACK & ROSEN PA TRUST ACCT; VER: N; A
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: COURT REGISTRY CHK# 975170 $100.00 >; VER: N; A
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
AS TO: Comment: FOR: GARN ATTY FEES/ORDER 041212 UNIFUND V MONROE/#1187198; VER: N; A
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
April 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER TO REFUND MONEY FROM COURT REGISTRY; VER: F; P
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.