Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Commonwealth Financial Systems Inc, Bank One Delware N A, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Patrick A Carey, against Kass, Kann, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - County |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Recording Of Judgment Lien - Fee Paid $ Comment: RECORDING OF JDMT LIEN - FEE PAID $10.00; VER: N; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
May 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDING Comment: C/C JUDGEMENT MADE/HANDED RECORDING OR16271PG1766-001; VER: N; K Vol./Book 16271, Page 1766, 001 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
May 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN Comment: PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
FACT INFORMATION SHEET Comment: FACT INFORMATION SHEET (BLANK); VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT OR16239PG1648-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16239, Page 1648, 001 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED; VER: N; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.