Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hicks, David C, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Donald C Anderson, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedFebruary 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: MASTER ORDER (09-046) DISMISSAL CALENDAR AS FOLLOW:; VER: N; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: HARRINGTON ROGER WESLEY OR16474PG1258-002; VER: F; K Vol./Book 16474, Page 1258, 002 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
September 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S) Comment: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S) (S)/PLTF(S) ATTY(S); VER: N; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
September 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY 000000 A Comment: HARRINGTON ROGER WESLEY; VER: N; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
September 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY 000000 A Comment: NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY: 102708 AS FOLLOWS:; VER: N; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF DAVID HICKS; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
March 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 046 FROM SECTION SPC ICD; VER: N; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (9:30 AM) () Result: LEGACY MINUTES
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT-JUDGMENT UPON RECEIPT OF Comment: DEFAULT-JUDGMENT UPON RECEIPT OF AFFDS IN PROOF OF; VER: N; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.