Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Jennifer T Harley, against Embley, Kathryn, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJAGGER, EDWIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedJanuary 05, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 046 FROM SECTION SPC ICD; VER: N; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT Comment: STIPULATION/ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT--031108; VER: F; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (3:00 PM) () Result: LEGACY MINUTES
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED Comment: NOTICE RETURNED SERVED; VER: F; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Comment: NOTICE TO PLTF/PLTF ATTY 03/06 @3:00 J/JAGGER; VER: F; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Comment: NOTICE/STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT/ PS/HEAVEN SENT; VER: N; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Filing - Fee Paid Comment: SMALL CLAIMS FILING FEE PAID $255.00; VER: N; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF CLAIM Comment: STATEMENT OF CLAIM; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
CASE FILED
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION SPC BY 8579 - RANDOM SC; VER: N; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.