Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Spine And Orthopaedic Center P A, Sparks Jennifer, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Marc B Nussbaum, Esq, against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, represented by Kimberly A Sandefer, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHESSINGER, KATHLEEN T Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
June 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (10:30 AM) () Result: LEGACY MINUTES
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
June 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONTINUED PRETRIAL RE Comment: NOTICE OF CONTINUED PRETRIAL RE: PENDING DISMISSAL; VER: F; K
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
June 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 044 FROM SECTION SPC BY 9345 - MANUAL S; VER: N; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
June 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
May 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 062608 10:30 J/HESSINGER; VER: F; D
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
May 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO COMPEL Comment: MOTION COMPEL BETTER/OR SUFFICIENT ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; D
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
May 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Comment: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION DEPO; VER: F; D
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Comment: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RESPOND DISCOVERY; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: 6/26/2008 @ 10:30 AM SPC (WITHIN 56 DAYS)MLD 5/8 J/HESSINGE; VER: F; K
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.